Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Adams, Arentz, Bhandari, Brooks, Carr, Charles, Crosby, Crutchfield, Fennell, Guyton, Krimm, R. Lewis, Queen, Rogers, Shetty, Valderrama, C. Watson, Wilkins, P. Young, and Howard
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to review the filing fees and associated requirements of neighboring states that are equivalent or substantially similar to the filing fees required under § 1-203(b)(3)(ii) of the Corporations and Associations Article, and report, on or before January 1, 2021, recommendations to make Maryland more competitive with neighboring states, including whether to establish less frequent filing requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0359
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223992/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {223992/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM