Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Bagnall, Bartlett, Carey, Carr, Dumais, Feldmark, Forbes, Kelly, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person that obtains a highway work permit from the State Highway Administration to maintain a safe alternative pedestrian path at work sites that are within 1 mile of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority rail or bus rapid transit stations or Maryland Transit Administration rail or bus rapid transit stations, including Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) stations; requiring the Administration to make available information on best practices for the maintenance of pedestrian access in certain areas; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {250714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-24)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {250714/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (114-24) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Text - Chapter - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM