Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an official need not disclose the acceptance of a ceremonial gift or award of insignificant monetary value on a financial disclosure statement; and providing that a regulated lobbyist need not allocate and report by name the individual recipients of ceremonial gifts and awards of insignificant monetary value on a lobbying activities report.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-607, 5-705 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM