Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to defer to, rather than use information provided by, the insurance regulatory agency of a state or the National Association of Insurance Commissioners committee process in the certification or rating of an assuming insurer under certain circumstances; requiring that certain credit be allowed when certain reinsurance is ceded to certain assuming insurers that have their head offices or are domiciled in and licensed in a reciprocal jurisdiction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863093/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {863093/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901, 5-910, 5-917 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM