Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Qi, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Commission; providing for the appointment of a Senate cochair and House cochair of the Commission; providing for the staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Commission to study, consider, and make recommendations regarding certain matters; terminating the Act after June 30, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0223
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM