Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Waiver of Immunity From Suit in Federal Court and Venue
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Ivey, and Korman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Waiving the State's right to immunity from suit brought in a certain federal court alleging certain employment discrimination; and authorizing certain actions alleging discrimination to be brought in a federal court of competent jurisdiction.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Waiver of Immunity From Suit in Federal Court and Venue
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1012, 20-1013, 20-1032, 20-1036, 20-1037, 20-903 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM