Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain motor vehicle offenses related to following too closely do not apply to a group of individual trucks that are traveling in a unified manner at electronically connected speeds and are being operated in a certain manner; and authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations governing motor vehicle offenses related to following too closely.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Offenses - Following Too Closely - Application to Trucks
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Rules 45
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM