Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Barron, Bartlett, W. Fisher, Ivey, J. Lewis, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a police officer is justified in using force under certain circumstances; providing that a police officer is justified in using deadly force under certain circumstances; requiring a trier of fact to consider certain factors when assessing whether a certain police officer's beliefs and actions were reasonable; and requiring a trier of fact to consider a certain police officer's beliefs and actions from the perspective of a reasonable police officer.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:38 PM