Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the authorization for the Governor, with the approval of the Board of Public Works, to reduce a certain appropriation by not more than 25% of the total appropriation for any eight-digit program in the State operating budget in any fiscal year; and increasing to 7 the number of calendar days the Board must wait before approving a proposed reduction of an appropriation after the Secretary of Budget and Management publishes and provides certain notice of the proposed reduction.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0030
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {854264/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:57 PM
Click to return on the top page