Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act – Personnel Records – Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton’s Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero and Barron
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a record relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record for purposes of certain provisions of the Public Information Act; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer; defining "law enforcement officer"; and applying the Act prospectively
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0178
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Information Act – Personnel Records – Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton’s Law)
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page