Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Johnson, Lisanti, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to determine and implement the license fees for certain alcoholic beverages licenses in Harford County; requiring the Board to determine certain license fees in proportion to the amount of alcoholic beverages sales from each applicable license holder as a percentage of the total sales from alcoholic beverages in the county; and repealing the specified annual fees of certain licenses.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-1001, 22-1002, 22-1003, 22-1004, 22-1005, 22-1005.1, 22-1006, 22-102, 22-209, 22-701, 22-802, 22-803, 22-804, 22-805, 22-806, 22-807, 22-808, 22-809, 22-901, 22-902, 22-903, 22-904, 22-905, 22-906, 22-907, 22-908, 22-909, 22-910 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM