Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2021, or later.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0168
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM