Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding a haul seine to the list of methods a person may use to fish in certain waters of the Severn River under certain circumstances; repealing certain provisions of law that restrict the length of a haul seine that a person may use in certain waters of Anne Arundel County; and authorizing a person to use a haul seine to fish in the waters of Anne Arundel County except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0162
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {760010/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {760010/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-713, 4-714 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM