Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating two annual 7-day sales tax free periods, one, beginning in calendar year 2020, during the last 7 days of August and one, beginning in 2021, during the last 7 days of January during which the sale of certain textbooks bought by a full-or part-time student enrolled at a certain educational institution is exempt from State sales and use tax; requiring the student to possess a valid student identification card at the time of the purchase which establishes the student's full-time or part-time student status; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0890 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM