Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain tolls paid through the use of the E-ZPass Maryland program; providing that the subtraction modification does not apply unless the amount of qualified toll expenses incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year equals or exceeds $300; requiring a taxpayer to submit proof of the amount of toll charges paid during the taxable year to qualify for the subtraction modification; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0889 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM