Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law relating to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to enter into certain installment purchase agreements and create debt to acquire the development rights for agricultural or forestry land as part of the St. Mary's County Agricultural Land Preservation Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM