Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor without the consent of certain individuals if the minor is at least 16 years of age, consents to the immunization, and the health care provider determines the minor is mature and capable of giving informed consent with regard to the immunization; authorizing a health care provider to provide an immunization to a minor under certain provisions of the Act whether or not a parent is not reasonably available or objects to the provision of the immunization; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Immunizations - Minor Consent (Access to Vaccines Act)
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-4A-01 through 18-4A-05, 20-107, 20-120, 20-121, 20-122, 20-123, 20-124 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM