Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain grounds for a limited divorce and an absolute divorce; authorizing the court to decree a limited divorce on the ground of irreconcilable differences, if the marriage is irretrievably broken and there is no reasonable expectation of reconciliation; and authorizing the court to decree an absolute divorce on the ground of completion of a 6-month waiting period, if one of the parties has filed for a limited divorce under certain provisions of the Act at least 6 months before the filing of the application for divorce.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0402 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332014/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {173323/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-25)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
House 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {332014/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 35
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Amendment {173323/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 37
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (109-25) 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 39
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-102, 7-103 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:34 PM