Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a sole owner of a vessel to designate a beneficiary to take ownership of the vessel on the death of the owner; providing that a beneficiary may be indicated on a certificate of title for a vessel by the words "transfer-on-death" or "TOD" after the name of the registered owner; providing that designating a beneficiary does not affect ownership of a vessel until the death of the owner; authorizing the owner of a vessel to cancel or change the designation of a beneficiary without the consent of the beneficiary; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0998
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
5/15/2019
Legislative Date
5/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 5/15/2019 5/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-715, 8-715.1, 8-720 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:33 PM