Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord to make a certain disclosure to prospective tenants if the landlord uses a ratio utility billing system; requiring that a certain lease provision is unenforceable if a landlord fails to make a certain disclosure; requiring a landlord to provide a tenant with information to document a bill for certain utilities; providing that a tenant organization has the right of free assembly in certain areas within an apartment facility during reasonable hours and on reasonable notice to the landlord; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0967
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/01/2020
Legislative Date
9/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {740311/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/01/2020 9/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {740311/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page