Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of certain vehicle height monitoring systems in Baltimore County to enforce certain State and local laws restricting the presence of certain vehicles during certain times; and applying to Baltimore County certain provisions of law relating to vehicle height monitoring systems.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0041
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-111.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM