Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Toll Violations - Intercounty Connector - Hearing Venue
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a hearing on a video toll violation alleged to have occurred on the Intercounty Connector be held in Montgomery County if the person alleged to be liable resides in Montgomery County or in Prince George's County for all other persons; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/01/2019
Legislative Date
10/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Video Toll Violations - Intercounty Connector - Hearing Venue
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/01/2019 10/01/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Video Toll Violations - Intercounty Connector - Hearing Venue
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 1:50 PM