Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a foreign-influenced corporation from making a contribution to a campaign finance entity or making a donation to a person that makes independent expenditures or electioneering communications; prohibiting a foreign-influenced corporation or a foreign principal from making an independent expenditure or electioneering communication; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0087
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/09/2019
Legislative Date
9/09/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/09/2019 9/09/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/28/2020 4:18 PM