Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or the avionics systems of aircraft if the materials, parts, or equipment are installed on the aircraft in certain circumstances; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the amount of sales and use tax revenue lost from the exemption and any change to the number of aviation technicians employed in the State as a result of the exemption; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0121
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0065 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/05/2019
Legislative Date
8/05/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/05/2019 8/05/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:49 PM