Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Kerr, Reilly, Hettleman, Luedtke, Feldmark, and Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "breeding stable" as it relates to licensure, inspection, and regulation by the Maryland Horse Industry Board; and altering the definition of "horse establishment" to include a breeding stable.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2019
Legislative Date
10/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2019 10/08/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-701, 2-710, 2-713, 2-714, 2-715 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:31 PM