Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with certain State agencies, to adopt regulations to require periodic inspections for the presence of mold hazards and mold or moisture problems in each occupied public or nonpublic school facility in the State; authorizing the Department of the Environment along with the State Department of Education, to grant a waiver from certain inspection requirements; requiring an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the findings of the inspections; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2019
Legislative Date
7/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/15/2019 7/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1601 through 6-1604 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:30 PM