Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to October 1, 2024, the termination provision relating to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to impose a transfer tax on certain instruments of writing.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   138-1B., 138-1F. )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page