Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Beidle, Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering penalties applicable to failing to report a lost or stolen regulated firearm.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {238878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {238878/1 Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
Text - Third - Public Safety - Lost or Stolen Regulated Firearm - Reporting
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 52A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM