Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Griffith, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Hayes, Kelley, McCray, Patterson, Smith, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain new units to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 5 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-214, 11-206.3, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM