Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Hearings - Authority to Delegate
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to delegate to any Maryland Insurance Administration employee, rather than only one, who is designated by the Commissioner and admitted to the practice of law in the State the responsibility for holding certain hearings.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Hearings - Authority to Delegate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Hearings - Authority to Delegate
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-210 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM