Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interagency Commission on School Construction - Project Approval - Prioritization
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction,in approving public school construction projects, to give priority to a project located in or near a school facility that closed during the school year due to a severe issue in the facility.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Project Approval - Prioritization
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM