Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Felony Murder to review the provisions, penalties, and jurisprudence for felony murder, including its applicability to juveniles, in the State and in other states; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme for felony murder to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838170/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {838170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {838170/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment {838170/1 Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page