Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or after July 1, 2021, pharmacy services administrative organizations to register with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner before providing certain services in the State; requiring certain applicants to file an application on a certain form and pay a certain fee; providing for the expiration and renewal of certain registration; prohibiting certain pharmacy services administrative organizations from entering into certain contracts; providing that a certain notice from the Commissioner constitutes a certain waiver; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {947275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486384/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {947275/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {486384/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
(   15-2001 through 15-2019 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page