Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer and Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the authority, powers, and duties of officers and employees of the Field Enforcement Division in the Office of the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission over certain matters; substituting references to the Division and the Commission, respectively, for references to the Comptroller in certain provisions relating to alcohol and tobacco; authorizing the officers and employees to make certain cooperative arrangements with the Office of the Comptroller; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0900
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803325/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863398/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Miller) Adopted (130-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Floor Amendment {803325/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {863398/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Miller) Adopted (130-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
(   1-304, 1-313 through 1-315, 1-317, 1-321, 4-109, 6-101, 6-103, 6-105, 6-107, 6-108, 6-202, 6-203, 6-204, 6-205, 6-308, 6-328 )
(   3-101, 3-201 )
(   2-102, 2-103, 2-105, 2-107 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page