Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road)
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-39)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road) in Anne Arundel County between the Maryland Route 175/295 interchange and the Anne Arundel County-Howard County line, subject to certain placement and signage requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {170011/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {373120/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (40-87)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-39)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road)
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road)
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {170011/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {373120/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (40-87) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-39) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page