Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transfer With Success Act
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain procedures that require a public institution of higher education that denies the transfer of a credit or course to an enrolled student to report the denial to the student and the institution from which the student originates and submit to the Commission a report each year listing the denials and the reasons for the denials; and requiring the procedures to direct a certain institution to review a denial of the transfer of a credit or course.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transfer With Success Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transfer With Success Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Transfer With Success Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {124636/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transfer With Success Act
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Appropriations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:33 PM
Click to return on the top page