Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person located outside the State to have a certain license in order to sell premium cigars or pipe tobacco to a consumer in the State; requiring the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to issue a certain license; authorizing the holder of a remote tobacco seller license to sell premium cigars and pipe tobacco to consumers in the State; establishing the requirements for an applicant for a remote tobacco seller license; altering the price used to calculate the tobacco tax for certain products; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation Finance
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {529332/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465368/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {853823/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-3)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Elfreth and Salling)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation Finance 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {529332/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {465368/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Floor Amendment {853823/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-3) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Elfreth and Salling) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
(   16.9-101 through 16.9-214 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page