Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain employers to claim a credit against the State income tax in a certain amount for certain wages paid to certain individuals with barriers to employment; providing that the credit may not exceed 100% of the Federal Work Opportunity Credit claimed by an employer on the employer's federal income tax return, or the State income tax imposed for that taxable year, and may not be carried over to any other taxable year; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:27 PM
Click to return on the top page