Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson and Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2021, for administration of a voluntary certificate program for ethical special education advocates; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to a certain applicant; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1595
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1016 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   8-420 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM