Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Property Tax Credit and Rental or Use of Motor Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Beidle, Reilly, Guzzone, Elfreth, and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on certain residential real property located within a certain airport noise zone; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to choose to provide the tax credit only within a certain noise contour; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to vary the amount of the credit based on where the property is situated within the airport noise zone; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599431/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Text - Third - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Property Tax Credit and Rental or Use of Motor Vehicles
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {599431/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page