Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain employers of commercial motor vehicle drivers to provide safety records, maintenance records, and insurance information to a prospective employee driver; requiring a contract between a certain employer of commercial motor vehicle drivers and a subcontractor to require the subcontractor periodically to update safety records, maintenance records, and insurance information to the employer; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law)
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
(   16-803, 16-806 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM
Click to return on the top page