Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing members of the Motor Vehicle Administration Police to enforce the general criminal laws of the State and to make arrests in connection with provisions of law relating to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission and the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page