Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish a certain policy to support certain goals and improve the educational outcomes of pregnant and parenting students, collect and track certain data, and, on or before June 1 each year, beginning in 2021, submit the data in a certain manner to the University of Maryland Institute for Innovation and Implementation; requiring the Institute to analyze the data and submit certain reports to the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   4-138, 7-301.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM