Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Pinsky
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint or reappoint a member of the State Board of Education on or before January 1 of the year in which the member's term expires; requiring members appointed to the State Board to reasonably reflect specified demographic diversity of the State, to the extent practicable; establishing qualifications for members of the Board; requiring a member's term to begin on the July 1 after appointment; requiring the Accountability and Implementation Board to contract with a consultant to conduct a certain study; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {775260/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Washington) Rejected
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {864933/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Ways and Means 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {775260/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Washington) Rejected 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:29 PM
Click to return on the top page