Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Klausmeier, Griffith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to distribute certain fees in a certain manner; requiring an account holder of the Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan to be a State resident and file taxes before July 15 each year to qualify for a State contribution; requiring a qualified beneficiary to be under 26 years of age to receive a State contribution; prohibiting an account holder from qualifying for more than $9,000 of State contributions through a certain time period; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Appropriations 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page