Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain venison donation programs to report the name and home address of each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit and the number of deer donated by each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit to the Comptroller by January 31 each year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021, on testing of deer brought to deer processors for chronic wasting disease; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {835761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {835761/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page