Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public school to notify a student's parent or legal guardian about the status of certain school meal accounts under certain circumstances; prohibiting a public school from communicating about unpaid meal debt directly with a student; prohibiting a public school from taking certain actions in response to an unpaid meal debt; requiring a public school to ensure that parents and legal guardians are notified about the application process and eligibility requirements for meal programs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1173
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224234/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224234/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable as Amended Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable as Amended Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Ways and Means 42A
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (131-0) 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text - Chapter - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:19 PM