Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bailey, Carozza, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, Kelley, Ready, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from willfully and maliciously destroying, injuring, or defacing a campaign sign that is on another person's property; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor with a fine of up to $1,000, or imprisonment for not more than 60 days or both; prohibiting a person from willfully or knowingly obtaining or exerting unauthorized control over a certain campaign sign under certain circumstances; and establishing a fine of up to $1,000, or imprisonment of up to 60 days, or both for a violation of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:20 PM
Click to return on the top page