Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Benson, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Zucker, Elfreth, Griffith, McCray, Peters, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the pay rate for employees who are not receiving a forensic pay premium at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least a two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1474
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727270/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-11)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {727270/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Appropriations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-11) 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:16 PM