Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain educational qualification required for an applicant for a physical therapist assistant license who was educated in limited physical therapy outside any state; and altering certain educational qualifications for applicants for physical therapy licenses or physical therapist assistant licenses who were educated in any state to require the applicant to have graduated from a certain accredited physical therapist assistant program and have satisfactorily completed the clinical training required.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0551
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324937/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {324937/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
(   13-303, 13-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page